The Hopeton State Bank

Oklahoma – Woods – Hopeton

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

12585

1919

FDIC Certificate Number: 12585
FDIC's unique number: 7993
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Oklahoma City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 877958
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1919-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Hopeton State Bank.
1972-01-01 Changed name to The Hopeton State Bank .

Total assets: $23,249,000
Total deposits: $18,443,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $18,443,000
Equity capital: $4,707,000

Net income: $122,000

Return on Assets: 1.07
Return on Equity: 5.39
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Hopeton Bancshares, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Hopeton State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Hopeton State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Hopeton State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-315

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.