The Huntington National Bank of Florida

Florida – Orange – Maitland

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

26830

1986

FDIC Certificate Number: 26830
FDIC's unique number: 36056
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tampa

Federal Reserve ID Number: 680233
Report Date: 1997-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21058
The date of the last data update: 1997-07-22

1986-11-03 Institution established. Original name: Security National Bank Of America.
1988-11-01 Changed name to Security National Bank Of Orange County .
1991-04-30 Acquired Security National Bank Of Osceola in Kissimmee, Florida.
1991-04-30 Changed name to Security National Bank .
1991-04-30 Acquired Security National Bank Of Seminole County in Altamonte Springs, Florida.
1991-04-30 Acquired Security National Bank Of Brevard in Melbourne, Florida.
1995-05-01 Acquired Huntington Federal Savings Bank in Sebring, Florida.
1995-05-01 Changed name to The Huntington National Bank Of Florida .
1995-05-16 Acquired Reliance Bank Of Florida in Melbourne, Florida.
1995-07-11 Acquired First Seminole Bank in Lake Mary, Florida.
1996-01-23 Acquired The Huntington National Bank Of Lakeland in Lakeland, Florida.
1996-01-23 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1997-02-28 Acquired Citizens National Bank Of Leesburg in Leesburg, Florida.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Huntington National Bank in Columbus, Ohio.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-old State Bank in Fremont, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-commercial Bank in Greenville, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-sault Bank in Sault Ste. Marie, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-lumberman's Bank in Muskegon, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-first Michigan Bank in Zeeland, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-oceana Bank in Hart, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-northwestern Bank in Boyne City, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-reed City Bank in Reed City, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-state Savings Bank in Lowell, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-maynard Allen Bank in Portland, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-security Bank in Manistee, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-community Bank in Dowagiac, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-first Michigan Bank in Grand Rapids, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-arcadia Bank in Kalamazoo, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-trust in Holland Township, Michigan.
1997-10-31 Acquired The Bank Of Winter Park in Winter Park, Florida.
1999-01-29 Acquired The Huntington State Bank in Alexandria, Ohio.
1999-06-30 Reorganized.
2000-06-23 Acquired The Empire National Bank Of Traverse City in Traverse City, Michigan.
2006-03-01 Acquired Unizan Bank, National Association in Canton, Ohio.
2006-03-01 Acquired Unizan Financial Services Group, National Association in Canton, Ohio.
2007-08-31 Acquired Sky Trust, National Association in Pepper Pike, Ohio.
2007-09-21 Acquired Sky Bank in Salineville, Ohio.
2009-10-02 Acquired Warren Bank in Warren, Michigan as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $1,728,551,000
Total deposits: $1,401,870,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Huntington National Bank of Florida does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Huntington National Bank of Florida, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Huntington National Bank of Florida will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-431

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.