The Liberty State Bank

Ohio – Henry – Liberty Center

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

397

1914

FDIC Certificate Number: 397
FDIC's unique number: 304
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 844428
Report Date: 1982-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1914-07-14 Institution established. Original name: The Liberty State Savings Bank.
1979-05-01 Changed name to The Liberty State Bank .
1982-07-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Maumee Valley National Bank in Defiance, Ohio.
1983-08-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Maumee Valley National Bank in Defiance, Ohio.
1984-12-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Toledo Trust Company in Toledo, Ohio.
1988-02-01 Changed name to Trustcorp Bank, Ohio .
1988-03-12 Acquired Trustcorp Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
1988-03-12 Acquired Trustcorp Company, Dayton in Dayton, Ohio.
1990-01-22 Changed name to Society Bank & Trust .
1993-08-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Society National Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
1994-09-16 Acquired State Home Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Bowling Green, Ohio.
1996-06-17 Changed name to Keybank National Association .
1996-06-17 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bryan, Ohio.
1997-06-23 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Florida, National Association in Naples, Florida.
1997-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1998-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1998-07-31 Acquired Keytrust Company National Association in Cheyenne, Wyoming.
1999-08-16 Reorganized.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Albany, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Portland, Maine.
2000-12-29 Acquired Society Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Ohio, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2003-01-17 Acquired Union Bank & Trust in Denver, Colorado.
2003-11-20 Reorganized.
2004-10-01 Acquired Key Bank Usa, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2004-11-12 Acquired Evertrust Bank in Everett, Washington.
2008-01-17 Acquired Union State Bank in Nanuet, New York.

Total assets: $20,688,000
Total deposits: $18,348,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Liberty State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Liberty State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Liberty State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-165

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.