The Matewan National Bank

West Virginia – Mingo – Williamson

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

6777

1913

FDIC Certificate Number: 6777
FDIC's unique number: 4554
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Scott Depot

Federal Reserve ID Number: 947132
Report Date: 2000-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 10370
The date of the last data update: 2000-07-24

1913-05-15 Institution established. Original name: The Matewan National Bank.
1984-07-20 Reorganized.
1987-12-21 Acquired Gilbert Bank And Trust Company in Gilbert, West Virginia.
1987-12-21 Acquired American National Bank in Logan, West Virginia.
1997-09-19 Acquired Matewan National Bank/kentucky in Pikeville, Kentucky.
1997-09-19 Moved bank headquarters from Matewan, West Virginia to Williamson, West Virginia.
2000-04-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Branch Banking and Trust Company in Winston Salem, North Carolina.
2000-05-20 Acquired First Liberty Bank in Macon, Georgia.
2000-07-15 Acquired Farmers & Merchants Bank in Summerville, Georgia.
2000-07-15 Acquired Premier Bank in Atlanta, Georgia.
2000-07-15 Acquired Bank Atlanta in Decatur, Georgia.
2000-07-15 Acquired First Citizens Bank in Newnan, Georgia.
2000-07-15 Acquired First Citizens Bank in Fayetteville, Georgia.
2000-07-15 Acquired Milton National Bank in Roswell, Georgia.
2000-11-10 Acquired One Valley Bank, National Association in Charleston, West Virginia.
2000-11-10 Acquired One Valley Bank-east, National Association in Martinsburg, West Virginia.
2000-11-10 Acquired One Valley Bank - South, Inc. in Summersville, West Virginia.
2000-11-10 Acquired One Valley Bank, Inc. in Morgantown, West Virginia.
2000-11-10 Acquired One Valley Bank - North, Inc. in Moundsville, West Virginia.
2000-11-10 Acquired One Valley Bank Of Huntington in Huntington, West Virginia.
2000-11-10 Acquired One Valley Bank Of Mercer County, Inc. in Princeton, West Virginia.
2001-03-16 Acquired Fcnb Bank in Frederick, Maryland.
2001-05-12 Acquired First National Bank Of Northwest Georgia in Calhoun, Georgia.
2001-05-12 Acquired Hardwick Bank & Trust Company in Dalton, Georgia.
2001-05-12 Acquired First Bulloch Bank & Trust Company in Statesboro, Georgia.
2001-05-12 Acquired Metter Banking Company in Metter, Georgia.
2001-05-12 Acquired First National Bank Of Effingham in Springfield, Georgia.
2001-05-12 Acquired Wayne National Bank in Jesup, Georgia.
2001-07-13 Acquired The First National Bank And Trust Company Athens, Tennessee in Athens, Tennessee.
2001-07-13 Acquired Bankfirst in Knoxville, Tennessee.
2001-07-13 Acquired Bankfirst Trust Company in Knoxville, Tennessee.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Fannin County, National Association in Blue Ridge, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Dahlonega in Dahlonega, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Danielsville in Danielsville, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Ellijay in Ellijay, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of The Coastal Region, National Association in Savannah, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Northeast Georgia, National Association in Gainesville, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Lavonia in Lavonia, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Alabama in Oxford, Alabama.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of The Carolinas in Waynesville, North Carolina.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Dawsonville in Dawsonville, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Central Georgia, National Association in Macon, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Polk County in Copperhill, Tennessee.
2002-03-16 Acquired F & M Bank-west Virginia, Inc. in Ranson, West Virginia.
2002-03-16 Acquired F&m; Bank - Maryland, Inc. in Bethesda, Maryland.
2002-05-11 Acquired Community First Bank in Carrollton, Georgia.
2002-07-12 Acquired Area Trust Company in Owensboro, Kentucky.
2002-07-12 Acquired Area Bank in Owensboro, Kentucky.
2002-07-12 Acquired The Vine Street Trust Company in Owensboro, Kentucky.
2002-09-13 Acquired Bank Of Louisville in Louisville, Kentucky.
2002-11-08 Acquired First South Bank in Tallahassee, Florida.
2003-03-14 Acquired Equitable Bank in Wheaton, Maryland.
2003-10-11 Acquired Farmers Bank Of Maryland in Annapolis, Maryland.
2003-10-11 Acquired Atlantic Bank in Ocean City, Maryland.
2004-06-11 Acquired Republic Bank in Saint Petersburg, Florida.
2006-09-16 Acquired Main Street Bank in Covington, Georgia.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Home Bank in Ducktown, Tennessee.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Bank/first Citizens Bank in Cleveland, Tennessee.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Home Bank Of Tennessee in Maryville, Tennessee.
2006-12-31 Acquired Branch Banking And Trust Company Of South Carolina in Greenville, South Carolina.
2006-12-31 Acquired Branch Banking And Trust Company Of Virginia in Richmond, Virginia.
2007-08-18 Acquired Coastal Federal Bank in Myrtle Beach, South Carolina.
2008-12-12 Acquired Haven Trust Bank in Duluth, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-14 Acquired Colonial Bank in Montgomery, Alabama as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $733,167,000
Total deposits: $573,870,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Matewan National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Matewan National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Matewan National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-275

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.