The National Bank of Northern Virginia

Virginia – Loudoun – Sterling

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

26836

1986

FDIC Certificate Number: 26836
FDIC's unique number: 36062
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Richmond

Federal Reserve ID Number: 895224
Report Date: 1990-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21140
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-30

1986-11-19 Institution established. Original name: The National Bank Of Northern Virginia.
1990-09-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Crestar Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
1990-09-28 Acquired Seasons Federal Savings Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
1990-09-28 Acquired Security Federal Savings Association in Richmond, Virginia.
1991-02-01 Acquired Community Trust Bank in Portsmouth, Virginia.
1991-07-05 Acquired Heritage Federal Savings Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
1991-09-20 Acquired United Federal Savings Bank in Vienna, Virginia.
1992-01-10 Acquired Perpetual Savings Bank, Fsb in Mclean, Virginia.
1993-05-14 Acquired Continental Federal Savings Bank in Fairfax, Virginia.
1994-01-28 Acquired Virginia Federal Savings Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
1994-03-18 Acquired Providence Savings And Loan Association, F.A. in Vienna, Virginia.
1994-03-18 Acquired Nvr Savings Bank, Fsb in Mclean, Virginia.
1994-05-13 Acquired Piedmont Federal Savings Association in Manassas, Virginia as part of a government assisted transaction.
1995-01-20 Acquired Independent Bank in Manassas, Virginia.
1995-01-20 Acquired Jefferson Savings And Loan Association, F.A. in Warrenton, Virginia.
1995-03-24 Acquired Tidemark Bank in Newport News, Virginia.
1996-11-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Crestar Bank in Vienna, Virginia.
1997-03-14 Acquired Citizens Bank Of Maryland in Laurel, Maryland.
1997-03-14 Acquired Citizens Bank Of Washington, National Association in Washington, District Of Columbia.
1997-11-14 Acquired American National Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Baltimore, Maryland.
2000-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of SunTrust Bank in Atlanta, Georgia.
2000-08-18 Moved bank headquarters from Richmond, Virginia to Atlanta, Georgia.
2003-06-02 Acquired Lighthouse Community Bank in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2005-04-22 Acquired National Bank Of Commerce in Memphis, Tennessee.
2005-04-22 Acquired Nbc Bank, Fsb in Memphis, Tennessee.
2005-04-22 Acquired Suntrust Bankcard, National Association in Orlando, Florida.
2008-07-25 Acquired Gainesville Bank & Trust in Gainesville, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Community Trust Bank in Hiram, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired First National Bank Of The South in Milledgeville, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired United Bank & Trust Company in Rockmart, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Home Town Bank Of Villa Rica in Villa Rica, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired First National Bank Of Gwinnett in Duluth, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Mountain State Bank in Dawsonville, Georgia.
2008-08-01 Acquired First Priority Bank in Bradenton, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $23,867,000
Total deposits: $16,181,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The National Bank of Northern Virginia does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The National Bank of Northern Virginia, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The National Bank of Northern Virginia will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-429

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.