The Pickerington Bank

Ohio – Fairfield – Pickerington

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

5987

1910

FDIC Certificate Number: 5987
FDIC's unique number: 4059
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 327622
Report Date: 1976-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1910-01-02 Institution established. Original name: The Pickerington Bank.
1976-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Huntington National Bank of Columbus in Columbus, Ohio.
1979-12-31 Changed name to The Huntington National Bank .
1979-12-31 Acquired The Huntington National Bank Of Bellefontaine in Bellefontaine, Ohio.
1979-12-31 Acquired The Huntington National Bank Of Franklin in Franklin, Ohio.
1979-12-31 Acquired The Huntington Portage National Bank Of Kent in Kent, Ohio.
1979-12-31 Acquired The Huntington First National Bank Of Kenton in Kenton, Ohio.
1979-12-31 Acquired The Huntington First National Bank Of Lima in Lima, Ohio.
1979-12-31 Acquired The Huntington National Bank Of London in London, Ohio.
1979-12-31 Acquired The Huntington First National Bank Of Medina County in Wadsworth, Ohio.
1979-12-31 Acquired The Huntington Bank Of Washington Court House in Washington Court House, Ohio.
1979-12-31 Acquired The Huntington Bank Of Chillicothe in Chillicothe, Ohio.
1979-12-31 Acquired The Huntington Bank Of Ashland in Ashland, Ohio.
1979-12-31 Acquired The Huntington Bank Of Wood County in Bowling Green, Ohio.
1979-12-31 Acquired The Huntington Lagonda National Bank Of Springfield in Springfield, Ohio.
1979-12-31 Acquired The Huntington Bank Of Woodville in Woodville, Ohio.
1979-12-31 Acquired The Huntington Bank Of Toledo in Toledo, Ohio.
1980-03-31 Acquired The Farmers And Merchants Bank in Milford Center, Ohio.
1980-12-06 Acquired The First National Bank Of Burton in Burton, Ohio.
1982-03-18 Acquired The Reeves Banking And Trust Company in Dover, Ohio.
1984-10-31 Acquired The Huntington National Bank Of Port Clinton in Port Clinton, Ohio.
1984-10-31 Acquired The Huntington National Bank Of Northeast Ohio in Cleveland, Ohio.
1989-05-01 Acquired The Citizens State Bank in Silverton, Ohio.
1993-05-07 Acquired Charter Oak Federal Savings Bank in Cincinnati, Ohio.
1995-10-27 Acquired The Huntington National Bank Of Kentucky in Cincinnati, Ohio.
1997-06-30 Acquired Huntington National Bank West Virginia in Charleston, West Virginia.
1997-06-30 Acquired The Huntington National Bank Of Indiana in Noblesville, Indiana.
1997-06-30 Acquired Huntington Banks Of Michigan in Troy, Michigan.
1997-06-30 Acquired The Huntington National Bank Of Florida in Maitland, Florida.
1997-06-30 Acquired The Huntington Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
1997-06-30 Acquired The Huntington Trust Company Of Florida, National Association in Naples, Florida.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-old State Bank in Fremont, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-commercial Bank in Greenville, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-sault Bank in Sault Ste. Marie, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-lumberman's Bank in Muskegon, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-first Michigan Bank in Zeeland, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-oceana Bank in Hart, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-northwestern Bank in Boyne City, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-reed City Bank in Reed City, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-state Savings Bank in Lowell, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-maynard Allen Bank in Portland, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-security Bank in Manistee, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-community Bank in Dowagiac, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-first Michigan Bank in Grand Rapids, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-arcadia Bank in Kalamazoo, Michigan.
1997-09-30 Acquired Fmb-trust in Holland Township, Michigan.
1997-10-31 Acquired The Bank Of Winter Park in Winter Park, Florida.
1999-01-29 Acquired The Huntington State Bank in Alexandria, Ohio.
1999-06-30 Reorganized.
2000-06-23 Acquired The Empire National Bank Of Traverse City in Traverse City, Michigan.
2006-03-01 Acquired Unizan Bank, National Association in Canton, Ohio.
2006-03-01 Acquired Unizan Financial Services Group, National Association in Canton, Ohio.
2007-08-31 Acquired Sky Trust, National Association in Pepper Pike, Ohio.
2007-09-21 Acquired Sky Bank in Salineville, Ohio.
2009-10-02 Acquired Warren Bank in Warren, Michigan as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $9,125,000
Total deposits: $8,233,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Pickerington Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Pickerington Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Pickerington Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.