The Port William Banking Company

Ohio – Clinton – Port William

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

5980

1906

FDIC Certificate Number: 5980
FDIC's unique number: 4055
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 135023
Report Date: 1971-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1906-12-01 Institution established. Original name: The Port William Banking Company.
1971-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Clinton County National Bank and Trust Company of Wilmington in Wilmington, Ohio.
1981-12-06 Changed name to The National Bank And Trust Company .
1982-01-01 Changed name to National Bank And Trust Company .
1982-01-01 Acquired The Brown County National Bank Of Mt. Orab in Mount Orab, Ohio.
1982-12-01 Changed name to The National Bank And Trust Company .
1982-12-01 Acquired The People's National Bank Of Georgetown in Georgetown, Ohio.
1992-09-01 Acquired Kentucky National Bank Of Ohio in Georgetown, Ohio.
1993-12-29 Acquired Williamsburg Building And Loan Company in Williamsburg, Ohio.
2001-12-10 Acquired The Sabina Bank in Sabina, Ohio.
2009-12-31 Acquired The Community National Bank in Franklin, Ohio.
2010-03-19 Acquired American National Bank in Parma, Ohio as part of a government assisted transaction.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Port William Banking Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Port William Banking Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Port William Banking Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-12

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.