The Sparks State Bank

Maryland – Baltimore – Sparks Glencoe

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

5868

1916

FDIC Certificate Number: 5868
FDIC's unique number: 4009
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baltimore

Federal Reserve ID Number: 298124
Report Date: 2002-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2002-06-03

1916-10-17 Institution established. Original name: The Sparks State Bank.
2002-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Mercantile-Safe Deposit and Trust Company in Baltimore, Maryland.
2005-04-21 Acquired Mercantile Potomac Bank in Gaithersburg, Maryland.
2005-05-18 Acquired Community Bank Of Northern Virginia in Sterling, Virginia.
2006-07-17 Acquired James Monroe Bank in Arlington, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2008-03-07 Acquired The Yardville National Bank in Yardville, New Jersey.
2008-08-08 Acquired Blc Bank N. A. in Strasburg, Pennsylvania.
2009-08-14 Acquired Dwelling House Savings And Loan Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-21 Moved bank headquarters from Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania to Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-08-21 Acquired Pnc Bank, Delaware in Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-11-06 Acquired National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.

Total assets: $271,583,000
Total deposits: $209,225,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Sparks State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Sparks State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Sparks State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-336

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.