The State Bank of Earlville

Iowa – Delaware – Earlville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

20258

1902

FDIC Certificate Number: 20258
FDIC's unique number: 13937
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Cedar Rapids

Federal Reserve ID Number: 604949
Report Date: 1988-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1902-01-22 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: State Bank Of Earlville.
1970-09-17 Became FDIC insured.
1970-09-17 FDIC certificate number changed to .
1975-10-09 Changed name to The State Bank Of Earlville .
1989-01-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community Savings Bank in Edgewood, Iowa.
1991-07-19 Moved bank headquarters from Earlville, Iowa to Edgewood, Iowa.
2005-06-20 Acquired Community Savings Bank in Robins, Iowa.

Total assets: $16,162,000
Total deposits: $14,424,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The State Bank of Earlville does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The State Bank of Earlville, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The State Bank of Earlville will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-83

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.