The Turner State Bank

Kansas – Wyandotte – Kansas City

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

10511

1912

FDIC Certificate Number: 10511
FDIC's unique number: 6729
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 549750
Report Date: 1987-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1912-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Turner State Bank.
1987-06-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Kaw Valley State Bank & Trust in Kansas City, Kansas.
1990-06-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Kaw Valley Bank in Overland Park, Kansas.
1991-12-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of MidAmerican Bank and Trust Company in Overland Park, Kansas.
1993-06-15 Changed name to Mercantile Bank Of Kansas .
1993-06-15 Acquired Mercantile Bank Of Kansas, National Association in Prairie Village, Kansas.
1996-02-24 Changed name to Mercantile Bank .
1996-02-24 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
1996-12-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Mercantile Bank in Overland Park, Kansas.
1997-05-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Mercantile Bank in Overland Park, Kansas.
1997-07-12 Acquired Mark Twain Kansas City Bank in Kansas City, Missouri.
1998-05-16 Acquired Mercantile Bank Of St. Joseph in Saint Joseph, Missouri.
1998-05-16 Acquired Mercantile Bank Of North West Missouri in Maryville, Missouri.
2000-03-31 Changed name to Firstar Bank Midwest .
2000-06-17 Changed name to Firstar Bank Midwest, National Association .
2000-06-17 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2000-06-17 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2000-10-11 Changed name to Firstar Bank, National Association, Overland Park .
2000-10-13 Changed name to Firstar Bank, National Association .
2001-07-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Firstar Bank, National Association in Cincinnati, Ohio.
2001-08-09 Changed name to U.S. Bank National Association .
2001-08-09 Acquired U.S. Bank National Association in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2001-08-09 Acquired U.S. Bank National Association Or in Canby, Oregon.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank National Association Mt in Billings, Montana.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in St. Paul, Minnesota.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in San Francisco, California.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in Phoenix, Arizona.
2002-01-11 Acquired U. S. Bank Trust, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2005-05-02 Acquired U. S. Bank Trust Interim National Association, Connecticut in Hartford, Connecticut.
2006-09-05 Reorganized.
2006-09-12 Acquired Weststar Bank in Vail, Colorado.
2007-02-06 Acquired Heritagebank in Great Falls, Montana.
2008-06-01 Acquired Mellon 1st Business Bank, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-11-21 Acquired Pff Bank & Trust in Pomona, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2008-11-21 Acquired Downey Savings And Loan Association, F.A. in Newport Beach, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-04-24 Acquired First Bank Of Idaho, Fsb in Ketchum, Idaho as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Park National Bank in Chicago, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired North Houston Bank in Houston, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired San Diego National Bank in San Diego, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Citizens National Bank in Teague, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Pacific National Bank in San Francisco, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Bank Usa, National Association in Phoenix, Arizona as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Madisonville State Bank in Madisonville, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired California National Bank in Los Angeles, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Community Bank Of Lemont in Lemont, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-01-01 Reorganized.
2011-01-28 Acquired First Community Bank in Taos, New Mexico as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $19,323,000
Total deposits: $16,964,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Turner State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Turner State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Turner State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-410

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.