The Waverly State Bank

Ohio – Pike – Waverly

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

5984

1922

FDIC Certificate Number: 5984
FDIC's unique number: 4058
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 136927
Report Date: 1984-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1922-07-31 Institution established. Original name: The Waverly State Bank.
1984-08-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, Portsmouth, National Association in Portsmouth, Ohio.
1997-05-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
1998-04-01 Acquired First Usa Federal Savings Bank in Wilmington, Delaware.
2003-08-08 Acquired Bank One, West Virginia, National Association in Huntington, West Virginia.
2003-08-08 Acquired Bank One, Wheeling-steubenville, National Association in Wheeling, West Virginia.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $34,345,000
Total deposits: $30,601,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Waverly State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Waverly State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Waverly State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-16

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.