Tidewater Bank

Maryland – Queen Anne's – Stevensville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

5869

1903

FDIC Certificate Number: 5869
FDIC's unique number: 4010
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baltimore

Federal Reserve ID Number: 299729
Report Date: 1971-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1903-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Tidewater Bank.
1971-08-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Equitable Trust Company in Baltimore, Maryland.
1972-02-19 Acquired The Clinton Bank in Clinton, Maryland.
1978-11-13 Acquired Truckers And Savings Bank in Salisbury, Maryland.
1979-02-26 Acquired University National Bank in Rockville, Maryland.
1982-07-01 Changed name to Equitable Bank, National Association .
1982-07-01 Acquired Columbia Bank And Trust Company in Columbia, Maryland.
1990-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Maryland National Bank in Baltimore, Maryland.
1991-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Maryland National Bank in Baltimore, Maryland.
1994-02-04 Acquired American Security Bank, National Association in Silver Spring, Maryland.
1994-04-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank, National Association in Bethesda, Maryland.
1994-04-29 Acquired Nationsbank Of Dc, National Association in Washington, District Of Columbia.
1995-03-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank, National Association in Richmond, Virginia.
1995-03-08 Moved bank headquarters from Baltimore, Maryland to Mclean, Virginia.
1995-09-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1996-04-15 Acquired Nationsbank Trust Company, National Association in Washington, District Of Columbia.
1997-06-01 Acquired Nationsbank, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
1997-06-11 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Vandalia in Vandalia, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Southwest Missouri in Carthage, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Kennett in Kennett, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired The Boatmen's National Bank Of St. Louis in St. Louis, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Central Illinois in Hillsboro, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Cape Girardeau in Cape Girardeau, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Lebanon in Lebanon, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's First National Bank Of West Plains in West Plains, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Mid-missouri in Columbia, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's River Valley Bank in Lexington, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Marshall in Marshall, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Quincy in Quincy, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of South Central Illinois in Mount Vernon, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Rolla in Rolla, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Pulaski County in Richland, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Coles County in Charleston, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Troy in Troy, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Franklin County in Benton, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Osage Bank in Butler, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Boonville in Boonville, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Nationsbank, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
1997-07-11 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Southern Missouri in Springfield, Missouri.
1997-07-11 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Oklahoma in Tulsa, Oklahoma.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Arkansas in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Sunwest Bank Of Albuquerque, National Association in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of South Arkansas in Camden, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Newark in Newark, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Iowa, National Association in Des Moines, Iowa.
1997-09-19 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Kansas in Prairie Village, Kansas.
1998-01-15 Acquired Sun World, National Association in Santa Teresa, New Mexico.
1998-01-23 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Illinois in Belleville, Illinois.
1998-03-13 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of St. Louis in St. Louis, Missouri.
1998-03-13 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company, An Oklahoma Trust Company in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
1998-03-28 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Arkansas in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1998-05-06 Acquired Nationsbank Of Texas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1998-07-09 Acquired Sunwest Bank Of El Paso, National Association in El Paso, Texas.
1998-07-09 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Austin in Austin, Texas.
1998-08-06 Acquired Nationsbank, National Association in Brunswick, Georgia.
1998-10-08 Acquired Barnett Bank, National Association in Jacksonville, Florida.
1998-10-08 Acquired Community Bank Of The Islands in Sanibel, Florida.
1998-11-12 Acquired Nationsbank Of Tennessee, National Association in Nashville, Tennessee.
1999-04-08 Acquired Bank Of America Texas, National Association in Irving, Texas.
1999-04-08 Reorganized.
1999-07-05 Changed name to Bank Of America, National Association .
1999-07-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1999-12-01 Acquired Bank Of America Utah, National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2001-05-31 Acquired Nationsbank Trust Company Of New York in New York, New York.
2005-06-13 Acquired Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Tidewater Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Tidewater Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Tidewater Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-335

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.