Tower Bank, National Association

Florida – Miami-Dade – Hialeah

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

24573

1983

FDIC Certificate Number: 24573
FDIC's unique number: 17075
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Florida

Federal Reserve ID Number: 874537
Report Date: 1985-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17746
The date of the last data update: 1999-09-18

1983-04-25 Institution established. Original name: First Bank Of Hialeah Gardens, National Association.
1983-06-13 Changed name to Tower Bank, National Association .
1985-10-04 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Bayshore Bank of Florida in Miami, Florida.
1987-08-07 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Eagle National Bank of Miami in Miami, Florida.
2004-06-21 Moved bank headquarters from Miami, Florida to Doral, Florida.
2009-03-01 Changed name to Jgb Bank, National Association .

Total assets: $20,523,000
Total deposits: $19,722,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Tower Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Tower Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Tower Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-443

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.