Town & Country Bank and Trust Company

Kentucky – Nelson – Bardstown

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

15703

1907

FDIC Certificate Number: 15703
FDIC's unique number: 9970
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown

Federal Reserve ID Number: 692946
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 11
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-02-02

1907-09-09 Institution established. Original name: Farmers Bank & Trust Co.
1982-11-01 Acquired Bank Of New Haven in New Haven, Kentucky.
2004-05-25 Changed name to Town & Country Bank And Trust Company .

Total assets: $413,586,000
Total deposits: $333,240,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $333,240,000
Equity capital: $40,997,000

Net income: $-2,063,000

Return on Assets: -0.97
Return on Equity: -10.78
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: First Farmers Bank Holding Company

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Town & Country Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Town & Country Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Town & Country Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-220

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.