Trade National Bank

Florida – Miami-Dade – Miami

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

24572

1983

FDIC Certificate Number: 24572
FDIC's unique number: 17074
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Florida

Federal Reserve ID Number: 942333
Report Date: 1996-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17753
The date of the last data update: 1999-09-18

1983-04-21 Institution established. Original name: Trade National Bank.
1996-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of TotalBank in Miami, Florida.
1997-06-20 Acquired Universal National Bank in Miami, Florida.
1998-04-17 Acquired Florida International Bank in Perrine, Florida.

Total assets: $73,490,000
Total deposits: $54,068,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Trade National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Trade National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Trade National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-444

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.