Ultima Bank Minnesota

Minnesota – Polk – Winger

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

8867

1904

FDIC Certificate Number: 8867
FDIC's unique number: 5661
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Grand Forks

Federal Reserve ID Number: 225157
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-04-11

1904-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Farmers State Bank Of Winger.
1994-07-05 Changed name to Farmers State Bank Of Fosston - Winger .
1999-01-01 Changed name to Ultima Bank Minnesota .

Total assets: $115,653,000
Total deposits: $100,154,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $100,154,000
Equity capital: $10,406,000

Net income: $1,094,000

Return on Assets: 2.01
Return on Equity: 20.99
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Financial Services Of Winger, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Ultima Bank Minnesota does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Ultima Bank Minnesota, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Ultima Bank Minnesota will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-416

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.