Union Colony Bank of Loveland, National Association

Colorado – Larimer – Loveland

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

24578

1983

FDIC Certificate Number: 24578
FDIC's unique number: 17078
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver

Federal Reserve ID Number: 520852
Report Date: 1993-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17804
The date of the last data update: 1993-07-09

1983-06-20 Institution established. Original name: Valley National Bank.
1990-05-01 Changed name to Union Colony Bank Of Loveland, National Association .
1993-06-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Colony Bank in Greeley, Colorado.
1999-11-10 Acquired The First National Bank Of Johnstown in Johnstown, Colorado.
2008-02-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank in Fort Collins, Colorado.
2010-09-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank of Omaha in Omaha, Nebraska.

Total assets: $11,314,000
Total deposits: $10,524,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Union Colony Bank of Loveland, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Union Colony Bank of Loveland, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Union Colony Bank of Loveland, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-440

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.