Union Planters Bank of Florida

Florida – Miami-Dade – Miami

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

21615

1974

FDIC Certificate Number: 21615
FDIC's unique number: 14949
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Florida

Federal Reserve ID Number: 347134
Report Date: 1998-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-09-18

1974-06-04 Institution established. Original name: Capital Bank.
1975-05-01 Changed name to Capital Bank Of North Bay Village .
1977-12-30 Acquired Capital Bank Of Miami, N. A. in Miami, Florida.
1977-12-30 Changed name to Capital Bank .
1977-12-30 Acquired Capital Bank Of Kendale in Kendall, Florida.
1982-12-31 Acquired Capital Bank Of Broward County in Oakland Park, Florida.
1984-03-02 Acquired All American National Bank in Virginia Gardens, Florida.
1985-05-23 Acquired Central Bank in Delray Beach, Florida.
1988-06-06 Moved bank headquarters from North Bay Village, Florida to Miami, Florida.
1990-01-26 Acquired Creditbank in Cutler Ridge, Florida.
1991-09-25 Acquired Peoples First National Bank Of North Miami Beach in North Miami Beach, Florida.
1998-01-19 Changed name to Union Planters Bank Of Florida .
1998-08-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Planters Bank, National Association in Memphis, Tennessee.
1998-08-06 Acquired Bank Of Middleton in Middleton, Tennessee.
1998-08-06 Acquired Selmer Bank & Trust Company in Selmer, Tennessee.
1998-08-31 Acquired Transflorida Bank in Boca Raton, Florida.
1998-10-09 Acquired Magna Bank, National Association in Brentwood, Missouri.
1998-12-31 Acquired Ready State Bank in Hialeah, Florida.
1999-02-01 Acquired Merchants Bank in Houston, Texas.
1999-02-19 Acquired Bank Of Laplace Of St. John The Baptist Parish, Louisiana in Laplace, Louisiana.
1999-03-19 Acquired Charter Bank, S.B. in Sparta, Illinois.
1999-05-07 Acquired Ambank Illinois, National Association in Robinson, Illinois.
1999-05-07 Acquired Ambank Indiana, National Association in Vincennes, Indiana.
1999-05-21 Acquired The First National Bank Of Wetumpka in Wetumpka, Alabama.
1999-05-21 Acquired First Mutual Bank, S.B. in Decatur, Illinois.
1999-06-11 Acquired Bank Of Cumberland in Burkesville, Kentucky.
1999-06-25 Acquired First And Farmers Bank Of Somerset, Inc. in Somerset, Kentucky.
1999-07-09 Acquired The First National Bank And Trust Company Of Corbin in Corbin, Kentucky.
1999-07-09 Acquired First Bank Of East Tennessee, National Association in La Follette, Tennessee.
1999-07-16 Acquired Alvin State Bank in Alvin, Texas.
1999-07-16 Acquired Republic National Bank Of Miami in Miami, Florida.
1999-08-13 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Kentucky, National Association in Paducah, Kentucky.
2000-02-12 Acquired First State Bank Of Covington, Tennessee in Covington, Tennessee.
2002-06-21 Acquired Jefferson Heritage Bank in Denton, Texas.
2003-06-09 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Northwest Tennessee Fsb in Paris, Tennessee.
2004-12-11 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of The Lakeway Area in Morristown, Tennessee.
2005-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Regions Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2005-09-29 Acquired Regions Morgan Keegan Trust, F.S.B. in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-11-04 Acquired Amsouth Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2007-11-30 Reorganized.
2008-08-29 Acquired Integrity Bank in Alpharetta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-02-06 Acquired Firstbank Financial Services in Mcdonough, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $2,160,518,000
Total deposits: $1,241,234,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Union Planters Bank of Florida does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Union Planters Bank of Florida, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Union Planters Bank of Florida will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-55

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.