United Illinois Bank of Troy

Illinois – Madison – Troy

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

16702

1948

FDIC Certificate Number: 16702
FDIC's unique number: 10825
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Mount Vernon

Federal Reserve ID Number: 136945
Report Date: 1988-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1948-05-08 Institution established. Original name: Troy Security Bank.
1985-10-21 Changed name to United Illinois Bank Of Troy .
1987-09-15 Reorganized.
1988-06-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of United Illinois Bank of Collinsville in Collinsville, Illinois.
1991-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of United Illinois Bank of New Athens in New Athens, Illinois.
1991-10-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Central Bank in Fairview Heights, Illinois.
1994-03-22 Acquired The First National Bank Of Highland in Highland, Illinois.
1995-09-21 Acquired United Illinois Bank Of Southern Illinois in Benton, Illinois.
1998-09-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Mercantile Bank National Association in St. Louis, Missouri.
1998-12-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Mercantile Bank of St. Louis National Association in St. Louis, Missouri.
1998-12-12 Changed name to Mercantile Bank Of St. Louis National Association .
1999-07-10 Moved bank headquarters from St. Louis, Missouri to Saint Louis, Missouri.
1999-10-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Mercantile Bank National Association in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2000-03-10 Changed name to Firstar Bank Missouri, National Association .
2000-08-11 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Firstar Bank, National Association in Cincinnati, Ohio.
2001-07-13 Acquired Firstar Bank, National Association in Overland Park, Kansas.
2001-08-09 Changed name to U.S. Bank National Association .
2001-08-09 Acquired U.S. Bank National Association in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2001-08-09 Acquired U.S. Bank National Association Or in Canby, Oregon.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank National Association Mt in Billings, Montana.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in St. Paul, Minnesota.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in San Francisco, California.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in Phoenix, Arizona.
2002-01-11 Acquired U. S. Bank Trust, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2005-05-02 Acquired U. S. Bank Trust Interim National Association, Connecticut in Hartford, Connecticut.
2006-09-05 Reorganized.
2006-09-12 Acquired Weststar Bank in Vail, Colorado.
2007-02-06 Acquired Heritagebank in Great Falls, Montana.
2008-06-01 Acquired Mellon 1st Business Bank, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-11-21 Acquired Pff Bank & Trust in Pomona, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2008-11-21 Acquired Downey Savings And Loan Association, F.A. in Newport Beach, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-04-24 Acquired First Bank Of Idaho, Fsb in Ketchum, Idaho as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Park National Bank in Chicago, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired North Houston Bank in Houston, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired San Diego National Bank in San Diego, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Citizens National Bank in Teague, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Pacific National Bank in San Francisco, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Bank Usa, National Association in Phoenix, Arizona as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Madisonville State Bank in Madisonville, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired California National Bank in Los Angeles, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Community Bank Of Lemont in Lemont, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-01-01 Reorganized.
2011-01-28 Acquired First Community Bank in Taos, New Mexico as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $31,117,000
Total deposits: $28,078,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

United Illinois Bank of Troy does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with United Illinois Bank of Troy, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and United Illinois Bank of Troy will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-32

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.