United Missouri Bank South

Missouri – Jackson – Kansas City

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

17788

1957

FDIC Certificate Number: 17788
FDIC's unique number: 11739
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 702452
Report Date: 1990-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-04-23

1957-08-01 Institution established. Original name: Wornall Bank.
1973-04-20 Changed name to United Missouri Bank South .
1991-03-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of United Missouri Bank, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
1991-06-03 Acquired United Missouri Bank Northland in Kansas City, Missouri.
1991-06-03 Acquired United Missouri Bank Of Clay County, National Association in Liberty, Missouri.
1994-10-01 Changed name to Umb Bank, National Association .
1997-04-26 Acquired Umb Bank Kansas, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
1999-07-31 Acquired Umb Bank, Northwest in St. Joseph, Missouri.
1999-08-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of UMB Bank, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
1999-09-11 Acquired Umb Bank, Warrensburg in Warrensburg, Missouri.
1999-09-11 Acquired Umb Bank, Boonville in Boonville, Missouri.
1999-09-11 Acquired Umb Bank, Jefferson City in Jefferson City, Missouri.
1999-09-25 Acquired Umb Bank, Northeast in Monroe City, Missouri.
1999-09-25 Acquired Umb First State Bank Of Morrisonville in Morrisonville, Illinois.
1999-09-25 Acquired Umb Bank Of St. Louis, National Association in St. Louis, Missouri.
2000-03-04 Acquired Charter National Bank in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2000-03-04 Acquired Umb Oklahoma Bank in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2004-08-01 Acquired Umb U.s.a., National Association in Falls City, Nebraska.
2004-12-04 Acquired Umb Bank Omaha, National Association in Omaha, Nebraska.
2007-12-08 Acquired Umb Bank, Warsaw, National Association in Warsaw, Missouri.

Total assets: $119,314,000
Total deposits: $96,422,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

United Missouri Bank South does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with United Missouri Bank South, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and United Missouri Bank South will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21942

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.