United New Mexico Bank at Mimbres Valley

New Mexico – Luna – Deming

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

1174

1925

FDIC Certificate Number: 1174
FDIC's unique number: 805
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Albuquerque

Federal Reserve ID Number: 715555
Report Date: 1994-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-10-19

1925-10-01 Institution established. Original name: Mimbres Valley Bank.
1984-03-01 Changed name to United New Mexico Bank At Mimbres Valley .
1992-01-09 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1994-10-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Norwest Bank New Mexico, National Association in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
1995-03-10 Acquired The First National Bank Of Belen in Belen, New Mexico.
1995-04-21 Acquired The American National Bank Of Silver City in Silver City, New Mexico.
1998-05-16 Acquired Norwest Bank New Mexico Northeast, National Association in Tucumcari, New Mexico.
1998-11-21 Acquired The Bank Of New Mexico in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
1999-02-20 Acquired First Bank Of Grants, National Association in Grants, New Mexico.
1999-09-24 Changed name to Wells Fargo Bank New Mexico, National Association .
2000-03-18 Acquired The First National Bank Of Farmington in Farmington, New Mexico.
2000-03-18 Acquired Capital Bank in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
2002-06-15 Acquired Bank Of Santa Fe, National Association in Santa Fe, New Mexico.
2004-02-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2004-04-24 Acquired Pacific Northwest Bank in Oak Harbor, Washington.
2005-09-24 Acquired First Community Bank, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2006-06-17 Acquired State Bank Of Rogers in Rogers, Minnesota.
2006-09-23 Acquired Fremont National Bank Of Canon City in Canon City, Colorado.
2006-09-23 Acquired Centennial Bank Of Pueblo in Pueblo, Colorado.
2007-09-22 Acquired Placer Sierra Bank in Auburn, California.
2008-03-15 Acquired Greater Bay Bank, National Association in Palo Alto, California.
2008-10-18 Acquired The Jackson State Bank in Jackson, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired Shoshone First Bank in Cody, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired First State Bank Of Pinedale in Pinedale, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired Sheridan State Bank in Sheridan, Wyoming.
2009-01-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction-downtown, National Association in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2009-01-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction, National Association in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2009-02-02 Acquired Wells Fargo Financial Bank in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2009-04-25 Acquired Century Bank, National Association in Texarkana, Texas.
2009-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, National Association in North Las Vegas, Nevada.
2009-11-07 Acquired Wachovia Bank Of Colorado, Interim National Association in Denver, Colorado.
2010-03-20 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2010-03-20 Acquired Wachovia Bank Of Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $58,035,000
Total deposits: $54,090,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

United New Mexico Bank at Mimbres Valley does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with United New Mexico Bank at Mimbres Valley, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and United New Mexico Bank at Mimbres Valley will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-105

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.