United Security Bank

Tennessee – Hawkins – Mount Carmel

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

21936

1975

FDIC Certificate Number: 21936
FDIC's unique number: 15203
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Knoxville

Federal Reserve ID Number: 175832
Report Date: 1984-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1975-03-01 Institution established. Original name: United Security Bank.
1984-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Tri-City Bank and Trust Company in Blountville, Tennessee.
1987-05-19 Moved bank headquarters from Mount Carmel, Tennessee to Blountville, Tennessee.
2000-06-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Vantage Bank /Tri-Cities in Bristol, Virginia.
2003-10-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Branch Banking and Trust Company of Virginia in Richmond, Virginia.
2006-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Branch Banking and Trust Company in Winston Salem, North Carolina.
2007-08-18 Acquired Coastal Federal Bank in Myrtle Beach, South Carolina.
2008-12-12 Acquired Haven Trust Bank in Duluth, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-14 Acquired Colonial Bank in Montgomery, Alabama as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $14,732,000
Total deposits: $13,327,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

United Security Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with United Security Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and United Security Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-202

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.