Unity Bank

Minnesota – Chisago – Rush City

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

8545

1882

FDIC Certificate Number: 8545
FDIC's unique number: 5453
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 854052
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 10
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-07-23

1882-04-18 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank Of Rush City.
1986-07-11 Acquired Farmers State Bank Of Clarissa in Clarissa, Minnesota.
2005-06-01 Changed name to Unity Bank East .
2006-12-30 Acquired Unity Bank, National Association in Crosby, Minnesota.
2006-12-30 Changed name to Unity Bank .
2006-12-30 Acquired Unity Bank Central in Staples, Minnesota.

Total assets: $185,558,000
Total deposits: $170,562,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $170,562,000
Equity capital: $14,056,000

Net income: $311,000

Return on Assets: 0.33
Return on Equity: 4.47
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Kimberly Leasing Corporation

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Unity Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Unity Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Unity Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-129

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.