Universal Federal Savings Bank

Illinois – Cook – Chicago

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

29355

1923

FDIC Certificate Number: 29355
FDIC's unique number: 42189
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Chicago

Federal Reserve ID Number: 150679
Report Date: 2002-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2002-07-16

1923-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Universal Savings And Loan Association.
1992-08-20 Changed name to Universal Federal Savings Bank .
1992-08-20 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
2002-06-28 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Chicago Community Bank in Chicago, Illinois.
2002-06-28 FDIC closing information for Universal Federal Savings Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/universal.html.
2011-03-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Metrobank in Berwyn, Illinois.

Total assets: $51,628,000
Total deposits: $40,340,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Universal Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Universal Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Universal Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-412

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.