Universal Savings and Loan Association, A Federal Savings and Lo

Arizona – Maricopa – Scottsdale

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

32585

1988

FDIC Certificate Number: 32585
FDIC's unique number: 45419
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Phoenix

Federal Reserve ID Number: 726177
Report Date: 1989-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-02

1988-05-25 Institution established. Original name: Universal Savings And Loan Association, A Federal Savings And Loan Assoc.
1988-05-31 Acquired Universal Savings And Loan Association in Scottsdale, Arizona.
1989-02-17 Entered into a conservatorship.
1990-01-26 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First Arizona Savings and Loan Association in Glendale, Arizona.
1995-11-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1995-11-01 Changed name to First Arizona Savings, A Fsb .
1997-10-14 Moved bank headquarters from Scottsdale, Arizona to Phoenix, Arizona.
2002-12-02 Moved bank headquarters from Phoenix, Arizona to Scottsdale, Arizona.
2010-10-22 Failed. No active institution received any of its deposits or its assets.
2010-10-22 FDIC closing information for First Arizona Savings, A Fsb : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/firstazfsb.html.

Total assets: $71,735,000
Total deposits: $88,419,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Universal Savings and Loan Association, A Federal Savings and Lo does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Universal Savings and Loan Association, A Federal Savings and Lo, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Universal Savings and Loan Association, A Federal Savings and Lo will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-498

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.