Wainwright Bank & Trust Company

Massachusetts – Suffolk – Boston

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

27009

1987

FDIC Certificate Number: 27009
FDIC's unique number: 36451
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Boston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 689302
Report Date: 2010-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2011-03-30

1987-07-27 Institution established. Original name: Wainwright Bank & Trust Company.
1999-02-19 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2011-03-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Eastern Bank in Boston, Massachusetts.

Total assets: $1,106,395,000
Total deposits: $799,795,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Wainwright Bank & Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Wainwright Bank & Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Wainwright Bank & Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-484

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.