Webster Bank, National Association

Connecticut – New Haven – Waterbury

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

18221

1870

FDIC Certificate Number: 18221
FDIC's unique number: 12139
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hartford

Federal Reserve ID Number: 761806
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 24469

Number of Domestic Offices: 175
Number of Foreign Offices: 1
The date of the last data update: 2008-12-23

1870-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bristol Savings Bank.
1994-03-03 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1995-11-01 Acquired Shelton Savings Bank in Shelton, Connecticut.
1995-11-01 Changed name to Webster Bank .
1995-11-01 Acquired First Federal Bank, A Federal Savings Bank in Waterbury, Connecticut.
1995-11-01 Moved bank headquarters from Bristol, Connecticut to Waterbury, Connecticut.
1995-11-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
1997-01-31 Acquired The Derby Savings Bank in Derby, Connecticut.
1997-01-31 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1997-07-31 Acquired Peoples Savings Bank & Trust in New Britain, Connecticut.
1998-04-15 Acquired Eagle Bank in Bristol, Connecticut.
1999-04-21 Acquired Maritime Bank & Trust Company in Essex, Connecticut.
1999-05-19 Acquired The Village Bank & Trust Company in Ridgefield, Connecticut.
1999-12-01 Acquired New England Bank And Trust Company in Windsor, Connecticut.
1999-12-01 Acquired Community Bank in Bristol, Connecticut.
1999-12-01 Acquired Olde Port Bank And Trust in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1999-12-01 Acquired The Equity Bank in Wethersfield, Connecticut.
2000-06-23 Acquired Mechanics Savings Bank in Hartford, Connecticut.
2003-11-07 Acquired The North American Bank & Trust Company in Waterbury, Connecticut.
2004-04-21 Acquired Webster Trust Company, National Association in Waterbury, Connecticut.
2004-04-21 Changed name to Webster Bank, National Association .
2004-04-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2004-04-21 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2004-04-21 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2004-05-14 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank Of America in Fall River, Massachusetts.
2004-12-03 Acquired First City Bank in New Britain, Connecticut.
2005-02-28 Acquired State Bank Of Howards Grove in Howards Grove, Wisconsin.
2006-10-06 Acquired Newmil Bank in New Milford, Connecticut.

Total assets: $17,769,872,000
Total deposits: $13,850,175,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $13,770,447,000
Equity capital: $2,054,884,000

Net income: $76,691,000

Return on Assets: 0.86
Return on Equity: 7.53
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Webster Financial Corporation

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Webster Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Webster Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Webster Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6250

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.