Webster Five Cents Savings Bank

Massachusetts – Worcester – Webster

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

90297

1868

FDIC Certificate Number: 90297
FDIC's unique number: 17886
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma

Federal Reserve ID Number: 765505
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SB

Number of Domestic Offices: 8
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-05-20

1868-03-15 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Webster Five Cents Savings Bank.
1985-08-02 Became FDIC insured.
2009-03-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.

Total assets: $553,842,000
Total deposits: $465,671,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $465,671,000
Equity capital: $67,528,000

Net income: $1,090,000

Return on Assets: 0.39
Return on Equity: 3.26
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Webfive Mhc

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Webster Five Cents Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Webster Five Cents Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Webster Five Cents Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-372

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.