Wells Fargo Central Bank

California – Los Angeles – Calabasas

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

26839

1986

FDIC Certificate Number: 26839
FDIC's unique number: 36065
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (North)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 89162
Report Date: 2010-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2011-04-05

1986-11-20 Institution established. Original name: First Interstate Central Bank.
1986-11-20 Acquired First National Bank in Chico, California.
1987-01-01 Moved bank headquarters from Willows, California to Calabasas, California.
1997-10-31 Changed name to Wells Fargo Central Bank .
2011-03-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.

Total assets: $6,166,000
Total deposits: $634,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Wells Fargo Central Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Wells Fargo Central Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Wells Fargo Central Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-436

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.