Westbury Bank

Wisconsin – Washington – West Bend

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

28400

1926

FDIC Certificate Number: 28400
FDIC's unique number: 41234
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Milwaukee

Federal Reserve ID Number: 524971
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 718E3

Number of Domestic Offices: 17
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21

1926-01-01 Institution established. Original name: West Bend Savings And Loan Association.
1991-02-28 Changed name to West Bend Savings Bank, S.A. .
1993-10-01 Changed name to West Bend Savings Bank .
1993-10-01 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
2001-11-09 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
2001-11-09 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2001-11-09 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2008-12-31 Acquired Continental Savings Bank, Fsb in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2009-02-03 Changed name to Westbury Bank .
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $615,727,000
Total deposits: $548,702,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $548,702,000
Equity capital: $53,260,000

Net income: $-589,000

Return on Assets: -0.19
Return on Equity: -2.21
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Westbury Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Westbury Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Westbury Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-451

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.