Western Community Bank, National Association

Washington – Pierce – Tacoma

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

20252

1970

FDIC Certificate Number: 20252
FDIC's unique number: 13931
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Seattle

Federal Reserve ID Number: 416777
Report Date: 1985-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17256
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1970-09-14 Institution established. Original name: Western Community Bank.
1982-04-01 Changed name to Western Community Bank, National Association .
1986-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Western Community Bank in Tacoma, Washington.
1986-04-17 Acquired The Sound Bank in Federal Way, Washington.
1987-09-30 Acquired The Union Bank in Tacoma, Washington.
1990-01-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Key Bank of Puget Sound in Seattle, Washington.
1991-11-12 Changed name to Key Bank Of Washington .
1993-01-15 Moved bank headquarters from Seattle, Washington to Tacoma, Washington.
1993-01-15 Acquired Puget Sound Bank in Tacoma, Washington.
1993-01-15 Acquired The San Juan County Bank in Friday Harbor, Washington.
1993-01-15 Acquired Bellingham Bank in Bellingham, Washington.
1993-07-02 Acquired The Emerald City Bank in Seattle, Washington.
1993-07-23 Acquired Northwestern National Bank in Port Angeles, Washington.
1997-03-05 Changed name to Keybank National Association .
1997-03-05 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
1998-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1998-07-31 Acquired Keytrust Company National Association in Cheyenne, Wyoming.
1999-08-16 Reorganized.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Albany, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Portland, Maine.
2000-12-29 Acquired Society Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Ohio, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2003-01-17 Acquired Union Bank & Trust in Denver, Colorado.
2003-11-20 Reorganized.
2004-10-01 Acquired Key Bank Usa, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2004-11-12 Acquired Evertrust Bank in Everett, Washington.
2008-01-17 Acquired Union State Bank in Nanuet, New York.

Total assets: $41,131,000
Total deposits: $37,932,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Western Community Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Western Community Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Western Community Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-85

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.