Western Oregon Community Bank

Oregon – Lane – Cottage Grove

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

22677

1978

FDIC Certificate Number: 22677
FDIC's unique number: 15829
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Portland

Federal Reserve ID Number: 153867
Report Date: 1994-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1995-01-04

1978-07-06 Institution established. Original name: The Cottage Grove Bank.
1990-07-16 Changed name to Western Oregon Community Bank .
1994-12-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Centennial Bank in Eugene, Oregon.
1999-07-12 Moved bank headquarters from Cottage Grove, Oregon to Eugene, Oregon.
2002-11-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Umpqua Bank in Roseburg, Oregon.
2004-07-10 Acquired Humboldt Bank in Eureka, California.
2006-06-03 Acquired Western Sierra National Bank in Cameron Park, California.
2006-06-03 Acquired Lake Community Bank in Lakeport, California.
2006-06-03 Acquired Auburn Community Bank in Auburn, California.
2006-06-03 Acquired Central California Bank in Sonora, California.
2007-04-27 Acquired Vintage Bank in Napa, California.
2009-01-16 Acquired Bank Of Clark County in Vancouver, Washington as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-01-22 Acquired Evergreen Bank in Seattle, Washington as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-02-26 Acquired Rainier Pacific Bank in Tacoma, Washington as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-06-18 Acquired Nevada Security Bank in Reno, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $25,037,000
Total deposits: $23,050,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Western Oregon Community Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Western Oregon Community Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Western Oregon Community Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-140

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.