Westside Bank for Savings, FSB

California – Los Angeles – Los Angeles

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

32229

1984

FDIC Certificate Number: 32229
FDIC's unique number: 45063
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 974679
Report Date: 1993-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1993-09-30

1984-06-26 Institution established. Original name: Westside Savings And Loan Association.
1989-04-30 Acquired Viking Savings And Loan Association in Santa Monica, California.
1990-07-16 Changed name to Westside Bank Of Southern California .
1990-07-16 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
1993-09-24 Changed name to Westside Bank For Savings, Fsb .
1993-09-24 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1993-09-24 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Westside Bank, a federal savings bank in Los Angeles, California.
1994-04-15 Ceased operations as a result of a government supervised payoff, liquidation or closing. No active institution received any of deposits.
1994-04-15 Government conservatorship or bridge bank resolved.

Total assets: $81,689,000
Total deposits: $76,949,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Westside Bank for Savings, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Westside Bank for Savings, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Westside Bank for Savings, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-180

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.