Wilmot State Bank

Arkansas – Ashley – Wilmot

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

15550

1937

FDIC Certificate Number: 15550
FDIC's unique number: 9844
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Little Rock

Federal Reserve ID Number: 688341
Report Date: 1996-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1996-11-07

1937-10-12 Institution established. Original name: Wilmot State Bank.
1996-09-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Southeast Arkansas Bank in Parkdale, Arkansas.
1999-10-22 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2000-01-13 Changed name to Delta Trust & Bank .
2001-09-07 Acquired Sinclair National Bank in Gravette, Arkansas as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $10,468,000
Total deposits: $9,123,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Wilmot State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Wilmot State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Wilmot State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-161

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.