Woodland Bank

Minnesota – Itasca – Deer River

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

8863

1920

FDIC Certificate Number: 8863
FDIC's unique number: 5657
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Grand Forks

Federal Reserve ID Number: 788652
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 7
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-10-01

1920-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Security State Bank Of Remer.
1992-11-15 Changed name to Woodland Bank .
2007-05-22 Moved bank headquarters from Remer, Minnesota to Deer River, Minnesota.

Total assets: $106,261,000
Total deposits: $97,501,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $97,501,000
Equity capital: $8,083,000

Net income: $123,000

Return on Assets: 0.23
Return on Equity: 3.08
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Remer Bancorporation, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Woodland Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Woodland Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Woodland Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-420

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.