Zapp National Bank of St. Cloud

Minnesota – Stearns – Saint Cloud

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

9756

1889

FDIC Certificate Number: 9756
FDIC's unique number: 6243
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 825052
Report Date: 1998-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14805
The date of the last data update: 1999-03-23

1889-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Zapp National Bank Of St. Cloud.
1999-03-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of U.S. Bank National Association in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
1999-05-07 Acquired Northwest National Bank in Vancouver, Washington.
1999-07-15 Acquired Bank Of Commerce in San Diego, California.
1999-11-15 Acquired Southern California Bank in Newport Beach, California.
1999-11-15 Acquired Santa Monica Bank in Santa Monica, California.
2000-01-14 Acquired Peninsula Bank Of San Diego in San Diego, California.
2000-04-26 Acquired Wyoming Trust And Management Co. in Gillette, Wyoming.
2000-10-13 Acquired Scripps Bank in La Jolla, California.
2001-08-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of U.S. Bank National Association in Cincinnati, Ohio.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank National Association Mt in Billings, Montana.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in St. Paul, Minnesota.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in San Francisco, California.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2002-01-11 Acquired U.S. Bank Trust National Association in Phoenix, Arizona.
2002-01-11 Acquired U. S. Bank Trust, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2005-05-02 Acquired U. S. Bank Trust Interim National Association, Connecticut in Hartford, Connecticut.
2006-09-05 Reorganized.
2006-09-12 Acquired Weststar Bank in Vail, Colorado.
2007-02-06 Acquired Heritagebank in Great Falls, Montana.
2008-06-01 Acquired Mellon 1st Business Bank, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-11-21 Acquired Pff Bank & Trust in Pomona, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2008-11-21 Acquired Downey Savings And Loan Association, F.A. in Newport Beach, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-04-24 Acquired First Bank Of Idaho, Fsb in Ketchum, Idaho as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Park National Bank in Chicago, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired North Houston Bank in Houston, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired San Diego National Bank in San Diego, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Citizens National Bank in Teague, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Pacific National Bank in San Francisco, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Bank Usa, National Association in Phoenix, Arizona as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Madisonville State Bank in Madisonville, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired California National Bank in Los Angeles, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-10-30 Acquired Community Bank Of Lemont in Lemont, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-01-01 Reorganized.
2011-01-28 Acquired First Community Bank in Taos, New Mexico as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $316,218,000
Total deposits: $209,939,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Zapp National Bank of St. Cloud does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Zapp National Bank of St. Cloud, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Zapp National Bank of St. Cloud will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-225

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.