21st Century Bank

Minnesota – Hennepin – Loretto

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

9751

1917

FDIC Certificate Number: 9751
FDIC's unique number: 6238
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 340256
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1917-06-02 Institution established. Original name: Crosstown State Bank Of Cedar, Inc.
1980-01-28 Moved bank headquarters from Cedar, Minnesota to Ham Lake, Minnesota.
1980-01-28 Changed name to Crosstown State Bank Of Ham Lake, Inc. .
1998-01-01 Changed name to 21st Century Bank - North .
2002-11-09 Acquired 21st Century Bank in Rogers, Minnesota.
2002-11-09 Changed name to 21st Century Bank .
2004-09-03 Acquired State Bank Of Loretto in Loretto, Minnesota.
2004-09-03 Moved bank headquarters from Ham Lake, Minnesota to Loretto, Minnesota.

Total assets: $358,846,000
Total deposits: $308,188,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $308,188,000
Equity capital: $45,761,000

Net income: $677,000

Return on Assets: 0.38
Return on Equity: 2.99
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Dolphin Family Limited Partnership

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

21st Century Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with 21st Century Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and 21st Century Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-230

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.