American Bank

Colorado – Larimer – Loveland

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

21614

1974

FDIC Certificate Number: 21614
FDIC's unique number: 14948
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver

Federal Reserve ID Number: 580959
Report Date: 2002-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2002-11-13

1974-06-05 Institution established. Original name: American Bank.
2002-10-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Home State Bank in Loveland, Colorado.

Total assets: $133,705,000
Total deposits: $103,945,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

American Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with American Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-56

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.