American Bank of Casper

Wyoming – Natrona – Casper

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

22670

1978

FDIC Certificate Number: 22670
FDIC's unique number: 15822
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings

Federal Reserve ID Number: 956451
Report Date: 1985-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1978-06-22 Institution established. Original name: American Bank Of Casper.
1986-01-17 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Hilltop National Bank in Casper, Wyoming.
1994-11-10 Acquired National Bank Of Glenrock in Glenrock, Wyoming.

Total assets: $20,489,000
Total deposits: $18,905,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

American Bank of Casper does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with American Bank of Casper, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American Bank of Casper will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-145

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.