American International Bank

California – Los Angeles – Los Angeles

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

22675

1978

FDIC Certificate Number: 22675
FDIC's unique number: 15827
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (North)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 627461
Report Date: 1999-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-02-09

1978-07-03 Institution established. Original name: American International Bank.
2000-01-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of East-West Bank in Los Angeles, California.
2000-09-24 Moved bank headquarters from Los Angeles, California to San Marino, California.
2001-01-12 Acquired Prime Bank in Los Angeles, California.
2003-03-15 Acquired Pacific Business Bank in Santa Fe Springs, California.
2004-08-06 Acquired Trust Bank in Monterey Park, California.
2004-09-10 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2004-09-10 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2005-05-26 Changed name to East West Bank .
2005-09-07 Acquired United National Bank in San Marino, California.
2006-02-27 Moved bank headquarters from San Marino, California to Pasadena, California.
2006-03-18 Acquired Standard Bank in Monterey Park, California.
2007-08-18 Acquired Desert Community Bank in Victorville, California.
2009-11-06 Acquired United Commercial Bank in San Francisco, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-06-11 Acquired Washington First International Bank in Seattle, Washington as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $198,833,000
Total deposits: $166,821,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

American International Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with American International Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American International Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-142

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.