American National Bank

Connecticut – New Haven – Hamden

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

19399

1965

FDIC Certificate Number: 19399
FDIC's unique number: 13204
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hartford

Federal Reserve ID Number: 966106
Report Date: 1992-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 15496
The date of the last data update: 1993-08-11

1965-03-31 Institution established. Original name: The Hamden National Bank.
1973-07-02 Changed name to American National Bank .
1976-12-01 Acquired Laurel Bank And Trust Company in Meriden, Connecticut.
1985-08-30 Reorganized.
1993-03-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Lafayette American Bank and Trust Company in Bridgeport, Connecticut.
1996-08-31 Acquired The Bank Of Darien in Darien, Connecticut.
1996-11-29 Acquired Ust Bank/connecticut in Bridgeport, Connecticut.
1996-12-14 Acquired The Westport Bank And Trust Company in Westport, Connecticut.
1997-11-12 Changed name to Lafayette American Bank .
1998-01-08 Acquired The Bank Of Southington in Southington, Connecticut.
1998-08-21 Acquired The Dime Savings Bank Of Wallingford in Wallingford, Connecticut.
1999-03-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Hudson United Bank in Union City, New Jersey.
1999-05-20 Acquired Little Falls Bank in Little Falls, New Jersey.
1999-08-10 Moved bank headquarters from Union City, New Jersey to Mahwah, New Jersey.
1999-12-01 Acquired The Farmers And Merchants National Bank Of Bridgeton in Bridgeton, New Jersey.
1999-12-01 Acquired Jefferson Bank in Haverford, Pennsylvania.
1999-12-01 Acquired Jefferson Bank Of New Jersey in Mount Laurel, New Jersey.
2002-06-28 Acquired Connecticut Bank Of Commerce in Stamford, Connecticut as part of a government assisted transaction.
2006-01-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of TD BankNorth, National Association in Portland, Maine.
2007-01-01 Acquired Interchange Bank in Saddle Brook, New Jersey.
2008-05-31 Changed name to Td Bank, National Association .
2008-05-31 Moved bank headquarters from Portland, Maine to Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-05-31 Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
2008-05-31 Acquired Commerce Bank/north in Ramsey, New Jersey.
2010-04-16 Acquired Riverside National Bank Of Florida in Fort Pierce, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-16 Acquired First Federal Bank Of North Florida in Palatka, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-16 Acquired Americanfirst Bank in Clermont, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-09-30 Acquired Carolina First Bank in Greenville, South Carolina.

Total assets: $336,981,000
Total deposits: $303,840,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

American National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with American National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.