American Savings, A Federal Association

California – Los Angeles – Beverly Hills

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

29788

1885

FDIC Certificate Number: 29788
FDIC's unique number: 42622
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 418771
Report Date: 1983-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1885-01-01 Institution established. Original name: American Savings, A Federal Association.
1983-08-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of American Savings and Loan Association in Stockton, California.
1988-09-05 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of.
1988-09-30 Acquired American Savings And Loan Association in Stockton, California.
1988-12-31 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of New West Federal Savings and Loan Association in Stockton, California.
1992-03-01 Moved bank headquarters from Stockton, California to Irvine, California.
1998-10-08 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

American Savings, A Federal Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with American Savings, A Federal Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American Savings, A Federal Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20465

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.