American Trust Bank, National Association

Maryland – Allegany – Cumberland

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

6770

1933

FDIC Certificate Number: 6770
FDIC's unique number: 4548
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baltimore

Federal Reserve ID Number: 386526
Report Date: 1998-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23045
The date of the last data update: 1999-02-05

1933-11-13 Institution established. Original name: The National Bank Of Keyser.
1992-12-07 Changed name to American Trust Bank, West Virginia, National Association .
1993-12-30 Changed name to American Trust Bank Of West Virginia, Inc. .
1993-12-30 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1996-02-01 Acquired American Trust Bank in Cumberland, Maryland.
1996-02-01 Changed name to American Trust Bank, National Association .
1996-02-01 Moved bank headquarters from Keyser, West Virginia to Cumberland, Maryland.
1996-02-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1997-05-29 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank Of Western Maryland in Cumberland, Maryland.
1997-06-06 Acquired Washington County National Bank in Williamsport, Maryland.
1998-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Keystone Financial Bank, National Association in Harrisburg, Pennsylvania.
1999-08-20 Acquired Key Trust Company in Horsham, Pennsylvania.
1999-08-20 Acquired Financial Trust Services Company in Carlisle, Pennsylvania.
2000-10-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company in Buffalo, New York.
2001-02-10 Acquired Premier National Bank in Poughkeepsie, New York.
2003-04-01 Acquired Allfirst Bank in Baltimore, Maryland.
2003-06-14 Acquired Allfirst Trust Company National Association in Mclean, Virginia.
2003-06-14 Acquired Allfirst Trust Company Of Pennsylvania, National Association in Harrisburg, Pennsylvania.
2003-07-04 Acquired Allfirst Financial Center National Association in Millsboro, Delaware.
2007-11-30 Acquired Partners Trust Municipal Bank in Utica, New York.
2007-11-30 Acquired Partners Trust Bank in Utica, New York.
2009-05-23 Acquired Provident Bank Of Maryland in Baltimore, Maryland.
2009-08-28 Acquired Bradford Bank in Baltimore, Maryland as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-11-05 Acquired K Bank in Randallstown, Maryland as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $933,884,000
Total deposits: $659,813,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

American Trust Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with American Trust Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American Trust Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-276

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.