Angleton Bank of Commerce

Texas – Brazoria – Angleton

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

11546

1908

FDIC Certificate Number: 11546
FDIC's unique number: 7377
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 364252
Report Date: 1989-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1908-10-30 Institution established. Original name: Angleton Bank Of Commerce.
1989-12-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Victoria Bank & Trust Company - Central in Gonzales, Texas.
1989-12-15 Acquired First National Bank Of Hallettsville in Hallettsville, Texas.
1989-12-15 Acquired The First National Bank Of Nordheim in Nordheim, Texas.
1989-12-15 Acquired The First National Bank Of Schulenburg in Schulenburg, Texas.
1989-12-15 Acquired Bank Of Karnes County in Runge, Texas.
1990-01-04 Acquired The First National Bank Of San Marcos in San Marcos, Texas.
1990-08-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Victoria Bank and Trust Company in Victoria, Texas.
1990-11-08 Acquired Western Gulf Savings And Loan Association in Bay City, Texas.
1990-12-07 Acquired Karnes County Federal Savings And Loan Association in Karnes City, Texas.
1991-03-14 Acquired Crossroads Bank in Victoria, Texas.
1991-06-07 Acquired First Federal Savings, Fsa in New Braunfels, Texas.
1991-06-13 Acquired Texas Premier Bank Of Victoria, National Association in Victoria, Texas.
1991-08-09 Acquired Executive Banc Savings Association, F.A. in New Braunfels, Texas.
1992-12-02 Acquired The First National Bank Of Rockport in Rockport, Texas.
1993-02-28 Acquired New First City, Texas - Bryan, National Association in Bryan, Texas.
1994-06-30 Acquired Texas Commerce Trust Company-corpus Christi, National Association in Corpus Christi, Texas.
1995-06-30 Acquired Rosenberg Bank And Trust in Rosenberg, Texas.
1995-08-25 Acquired Cattlemen's State Bank in Austin, Texas.
1996-07-11 Changed name to Norwest Bank Texas, South Central .
1996-09-23 Acquired Norwest Bank Texas, Austin, National Association in Austin, Texas.
1996-09-27 Acquired Norwest Bank Texas, New Braunfels in New Braunfels, Texas.
1997-04-18 Acquired Texas Bank in Odessa, Texas.
1997-06-20 Acquired Norwest Bank Texas, Bay City, National Association in Bay City, Texas.
1997-08-22 Acquired West Columbia National Bank in West Columbia, Texas.
1997-11-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Norwest Bank Texas, National Association in San Antonio, Texas.
1998-06-15 Moved bank headquarters from Victoria, Texas to San Antonio, Texas.
1998-06-20 Acquired Continental State Bank in Boyd, Texas.
1998-06-20 Acquired Fidelity Bank & Trust, National Association in Fort Worth, Texas.
1998-09-28 Acquired Norwest Trust Texas, Odessa, National Association in Odessa, Texas.
1998-09-28 Acquired Founders Trust Company in Dallas, Texas.
1998-11-14 Acquired First State Bank in Austin, Texas.
1999-02-20 Acquired First National Bank Of Missouri City in Missouri City, Texas.
1999-03-20 Acquired First Valley Bank in Harlingen, Texas.
1999-04-17 Acquired The First National Bank Of Franklin in Franklin, Texas.
1999-06-19 Acquired Mercantile Bank, National Association in Brownsville, Texas.
1999-06-19 Acquired First Bank Katy, National Association in Katy, Texas.
1999-09-18 Acquired First State Bank in Rio Vista, Texas.
2000-01-12 Acquired The Bank Of South Texas in Floresville, Texas.
2000-02-12 Acquired First National Bank Of South Texas in San Antonio, Texas.
2000-04-14 Changed name to Wells Fargo Bank Texas, National Association .
2000-04-14 Acquired Norwest Bank El Paso, National Association in El Paso, Texas.
2000-04-14 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Texas, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2000-06-24 Acquired Prime Bank in Houston, Texas.
2001-06-28 Acquired Midland Trust Company, National Association in Midland, Texas.
2002-06-15 Acquired The First National Bank Of Texas in Decatur, Texas.
2002-06-15 Acquired First State Bank Of Texas in Denton, Texas.
2002-08-24 Acquired The First National Bank Of Amarillo in Amarillo, Texas.
2003-11-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2003-12-06 Acquired Bank Of Grand Junction in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2004-02-20 Moved bank headquarters from San Francisco, California to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Ohio, National Association in Van Wert, Ohio.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank New Mexico, National Association in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Illinois, National Association in Galesburg, Illinois.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank North Dakota, National Association in Fargo, North Dakota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Iowa, National Association in Des Moines, Iowa.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Michigan, National Association in Marquette, Michigan.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, National Association in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Indiana, National Association in Fort Wayne, Indiana.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Wisconsin, National Association in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Arizona, National Association in Phoenix, Arizona.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Nevada, National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2004-04-24 Acquired Pacific Northwest Bank in Oak Harbor, Washington.
2005-09-24 Acquired First Community Bank, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2006-06-17 Acquired State Bank Of Rogers in Rogers, Minnesota.
2006-09-23 Acquired Fremont National Bank Of Canon City in Canon City, Colorado.
2006-09-23 Acquired Centennial Bank Of Pueblo in Pueblo, Colorado.
2007-09-22 Acquired Placer Sierra Bank in Auburn, California.
2008-03-15 Acquired Greater Bay Bank, National Association in Palo Alto, California.
2008-10-18 Acquired The Jackson State Bank in Jackson, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired Shoshone First Bank in Cody, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired First State Bank Of Pinedale in Pinedale, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired Sheridan State Bank in Sheridan, Wyoming.
2009-01-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction-downtown, National Association in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2009-01-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction, National Association in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2009-02-02 Acquired Wells Fargo Financial Bank in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2009-04-25 Acquired Century Bank, National Association in Texarkana, Texas.
2009-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, National Association in North Las Vegas, Nevada.
2009-11-07 Acquired Wachovia Bank Of Colorado, Interim National Association in Denver, Colorado.
2010-03-20 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2010-03-20 Acquired Wachovia Bank Of Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $49,162,000
Total deposits: $42,056,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Angleton Bank of Commerce does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Angleton Bank of Commerce, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Angleton Bank of Commerce will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.