Arrowhead Federal Savings and Loan Association

Oklahoma – Oklahoma – Oklahoma City

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

32601

1988

FDIC Certificate Number: 32601
FDIC's unique number: 45435
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Oklahoma City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1217300
Report Date: 1988-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-01-01

1988-08-31 Institution established. Original name: Arrowhead Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1988-08-31 Acquired Mutual Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Oklahoma City in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
1988-08-31 Acquired Capitol Federal Savings Bank in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
1988-12-28 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of.
1988-12-31 Acquired Arrowhead Federal Savings And Loan Association in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
1989-07-01 Changed name to Equity Bank For Savings, F.A. .
1989-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Woodward, Oklahoma to Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
1989-12-31 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1994-05-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank IV Oklahoma, National Association in Tulsa, Oklahoma.
1994-06-30 Acquired Metro Bank Of Broken Arrow in Broken Arrow, Oklahoma.
1995-01-06 Acquired Stillwater Federal Savings Bank in Stillwater, Oklahoma.
1995-02-03 Acquired Security Bank And Trust Company in Blackwell, Oklahoma.
1996-09-13 Changed name to Boatmen's National Bank Of Oklahoma .
1996-09-13 Acquired Boatmen's First National Bank Of Oklahoma in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
1997-07-11 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Arkansas in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Sunwest Bank Of Albuquerque, National Association in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of South Arkansas in Camden, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Newark in Newark, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Iowa, National Association in Des Moines, Iowa.
1997-09-19 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Kansas in Prairie Village, Kansas.
1998-01-15 Acquired Sun World, National Association in Santa Teresa, New Mexico.
1998-01-23 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Illinois in Belleville, Illinois.
1998-03-13 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of St. Louis in St. Louis, Missouri.
1998-03-13 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company, An Oklahoma Trust Company in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
1998-03-28 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Arkansas in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1998-05-06 Acquired Nationsbank Of Texas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1998-07-09 Acquired Sunwest Bank Of El Paso, National Association in El Paso, Texas.
1998-07-09 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Austin in Austin, Texas.
1998-08-06 Acquired Nationsbank, National Association in Brunswick, Georgia.
1998-10-08 Acquired Barnett Bank, National Association in Jacksonville, Florida.
1998-10-08 Acquired Community Bank Of The Islands in Sanibel, Florida.
1998-11-12 Acquired Nationsbank Of Tennessee, National Association in Nashville, Tennessee.
1999-04-08 Acquired Bank Of America Texas, National Association in Irving, Texas.
1999-04-08 Reorganized.
1999-07-05 Changed name to Bank Of America, National Association .
1999-07-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1999-12-01 Acquired Bank Of America Utah, National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2001-05-31 Acquired Nationsbank Trust Company Of New York in New York, New York.
2005-06-13 Acquired Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $319,927,000
Total deposits: $299,410,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Arrowhead Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Arrowhead Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Arrowhead Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-279

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.