Asahi Bank of California

California – Los Angeles – Los Angeles

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

22671

1978

FDIC Certificate Number: 22671
FDIC's unique number: 15823
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (North)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 842367
Report Date: 2001-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2002-02-12

1978-06-26 Institution established. Original name: The Kyowa Bank Of California.
1991-04-01 Changed name to Kyowa Saitama Bank Of California .
1992-09-21 Changed name to Asahi Bank Of California .
2002-01-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Imperial Capital Bank in La Jolla, California.
2009-12-18 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of City National Bank in Los Angeles, California.
2009-12-18 FDIC closing information for Imperial Capital Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/imperialcapital.html.
2010-05-28 Acquired Sun West Bank in Las Vegas, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-04-08 Moved bank headquarters from Beverly Hills, California to Los Angeles, California.
2011-04-08 Acquired Nevada Commerce Bank in Las Vegas, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $72,288,000
Total deposits: $36,265,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Asahi Bank of California does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Asahi Bank of California, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Asahi Bank of California will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-146

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.