Bank of Ashland, Inc.

Kentucky – Boyd – Ashland

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

19588

1966

FDIC Certificate Number: 19588
FDIC's unique number: 13387
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington

Federal Reserve ID Number: 187910
Report Date: 1999-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-06-23

1966-05-23 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Ashland, Inc.
1985-04-01 Reorganized.
1999-04-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank, Ohio Valley in Hillsboro, Ohio.
2000-12-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fifth Third Bank in Cincinnati, Ohio.
2001-03-10 Acquired Capital Bank National Association in Sylvania, Ohio.
2009-09-30 Acquired Fifth Third Bank in Grand Rapids, Michigan.
2009-09-30 Acquired Fifth Third Bank, National Association in Nashville, Tennessee.

Total assets: $167,686,000
Total deposits: $141,598,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Ashland, Inc. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Ashland, Inc., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Ashland, Inc. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-353

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.