Bank of Eagleville

Tennessee – Rutherford – Eagleville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

9194

1901

FDIC Certificate Number: 9194
FDIC's unique number: 5888
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Nashville

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1014134
Report Date: 1983-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1901-05-01 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Eagleville.
1983-12-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Planters National Bank in Memphis, Tennessee.
1984-01-31 Acquired Hamilton First Bank, N.A. in Clinton, Tennessee.
1984-04-07 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Nashville in Nashville, Tennessee.
1992-03-27 Acquired Metropolitan Federal Savings And Loan Association, F.A. in Nashville, Tennessee.
1992-03-30 Acquired Fidelity Federal Bank, A Federal Savings Bank in Nashville, Tennessee.
1993-03-15 Acquired First Cumberland Bank in Madison, Tennessee.
1994-01-01 Acquired General Trust Company in Nashville, Tennessee.
1994-05-01 Acquired Tennessee National Bank in Columbia, Tennessee.
1996-08-29 Acquired Union Planters Bank, National Association in Memphis, Tennessee.
1996-10-01 Acquired Leader Federal Bank For Savings in Memphis, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Changed name to Union Planters Bank, National Association .
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Northeast Arkansas in Jonesboro, Arkansas.
1998-01-01 Acquired Simpson County Bank in Franklin, Kentucky.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Missouri in Clayton, Missouri.
1998-01-01 Acquired The Bank Of Goodlettsville in Goodlettsville, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Southeast Missouri in Cape Girardeau, Missouri.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of The Cumberlands in Cookeville, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of Crossville in Crossville, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of The Tennessee Valley in Harriman, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of South Central Tennessee in Hohenwald, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Shelbyville in Shelbyville, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Lexington in Lexington, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Northwest Mississippi in Clarksdale, Mississippi.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of West Tennessee in Humboldt, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of The Tennessee Delta in Brownsville, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Mississippi in Grenada, Mississippi.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of North Central Tennessee in Erin, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired Bank Of Commerce in Woodbury, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Southwest Tennessee in Somerville, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Northeast Mississippi, National Association in New Albany, Mississippi.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Southwest Missouri in Ozark, Missouri.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Mid-missouri in Columbia, Missouri.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Central Arkansas, National Association in Clinton, Arkansas.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Louisiana in Baton Rouge, Louisiana.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Alabama in Decatur, Alabama.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Chattanooga, National Association in Chattanooga, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Jackson, National Association in Jackson, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of East Tennessee, National Association in Knoxville, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Middle Tennessee, National Association in Nashville, Tennessee.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Central Mississippi in Jackson, Mississippi.
1998-01-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Southern Mississippi in Hattiesburg, Mississippi.
1998-07-06 Acquired Merchants And Farmers Bank in West Helena, Arkansas.
1998-07-06 Acquired Farmers & Merchants Bank in Des Arc, Arkansas.
1998-07-07 Acquired City Bank & Trust Company in Mc Minnville, Tennessee.
1998-07-09 Acquired Capital Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Jefferson City, Missouri.
1998-08-01 Acquired Duck Hill Bank in Duck Hill, Mississippi.
1998-08-01 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Florida in Miami, Florida.
1998-08-06 Acquired Bank Of Middleton in Middleton, Tennessee.
1998-08-06 Acquired Selmer Bank & Trust Company in Selmer, Tennessee.
1998-08-31 Acquired Transflorida Bank in Boca Raton, Florida.
1998-10-09 Acquired Magna Bank, National Association in Brentwood, Missouri.
1998-12-31 Acquired Ready State Bank in Hialeah, Florida.
1999-02-01 Acquired Merchants Bank in Houston, Texas.
1999-02-19 Acquired Bank Of Laplace Of St. John The Baptist Parish, Louisiana in Laplace, Louisiana.
1999-03-19 Acquired Charter Bank, S.B. in Sparta, Illinois.
1999-05-07 Acquired Ambank Illinois, National Association in Robinson, Illinois.
1999-05-07 Acquired Ambank Indiana, National Association in Vincennes, Indiana.
1999-05-21 Acquired The First National Bank Of Wetumpka in Wetumpka, Alabama.
1999-05-21 Acquired First Mutual Bank, S.B. in Decatur, Illinois.
1999-06-11 Acquired Bank Of Cumberland in Burkesville, Kentucky.
1999-06-25 Acquired First And Farmers Bank Of Somerset, Inc. in Somerset, Kentucky.
1999-07-09 Acquired The First National Bank And Trust Company Of Corbin in Corbin, Kentucky.
1999-07-09 Acquired First Bank Of East Tennessee, National Association in La Follette, Tennessee.
1999-07-16 Acquired Alvin State Bank in Alvin, Texas.
1999-07-16 Acquired Republic National Bank Of Miami in Miami, Florida.
1999-08-13 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Kentucky, National Association in Paducah, Kentucky.
2000-02-12 Acquired First State Bank Of Covington, Tennessee in Covington, Tennessee.
2002-06-21 Acquired Jefferson Heritage Bank in Denton, Texas.
2003-06-09 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Northwest Tennessee Fsb in Paris, Tennessee.
2004-12-11 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of The Lakeway Area in Morristown, Tennessee.
2005-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Regions Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2005-09-29 Acquired Regions Morgan Keegan Trust, F.S.B. in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-11-04 Acquired Amsouth Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2007-11-30 Reorganized.
2008-08-29 Acquired Integrity Bank in Alpharetta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-02-06 Acquired Firstbank Financial Services in Mcdonough, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $8,815,000
Total deposits: $8,168,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Eagleville does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Eagleville, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Eagleville will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-383

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.