Bank of Houston

Texas – Harris – Houston

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

16706

1948

FDIC Certificate Number: 16706
FDIC's unique number: 10829
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 647656
Report Date: 2000-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2000-11-16

1948-06-15 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Houston.
2000-10-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Whitney National Bank in New Orleans, Louisiana.
2001-02-09 Acquired First National Bank Of Gonzales in Gonzales, Louisiana.
2001-03-10 Acquired American Bank in Houston, Texas.
2001-06-08 Acquired Bank Of Prattville in Prattville, Alabama.
2001-10-26 Acquired Northwest Bank, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2004-08-20 Acquired Madison Bank in Palm Harbor, Florida.
2005-04-22 Acquired Destin Bank in Destin, Florida.
2006-07-21 Acquired 1st National Bank & Trust in Bradenton, Florida.
2007-03-03 Acquired Signature Bank in Saint Petersburg, Florida.
2008-12-06 Acquired Parish National Bank in Bogalusa, Louisiana.
2011-06-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Whitney Bank in New Orleans, Louisiana.

Total assets: $244,714,000
Total deposits: $182,113,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Houston does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Houston, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Houston will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-29

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.