Bank of Livingston County

Kentucky – Livingston – Tiline

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

273

1909

FDIC Certificate Number: 273
FDIC's unique number: 218
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hopkinsville

Federal Reserve ID Number: 643144
Report Date: 2000-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-10-05

1909-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Bank Of Tiline.
1978-08-11 Changed name to Bank Of Livingston County .
2000-08-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Area Bank in Owensboro, Kentucky.
2000-10-02 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2000-10-02 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2000-10-02 Acquired Citizens Deposit Bank in Calhoun, Kentucky.
2000-10-02 Acquired Southern Deposit Bank in Russellville, Kentucky.
2000-10-02 Acquired Hnb Bank, National Association in Harlan, Kentucky.
2000-10-02 Acquired First & Peoples Bank, Springfield, Kentucky in Springfield, Kentucky.
2000-10-02 Acquired Alliance Bank in Somerset, Kentucky.
2002-07-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Branch Banking and Trust Company in Winston Salem, North Carolina.
2002-09-13 Acquired Bank Of Louisville in Louisville, Kentucky.
2002-11-08 Acquired First South Bank in Tallahassee, Florida.
2003-03-14 Acquired Equitable Bank in Wheaton, Maryland.
2003-10-11 Acquired Farmers Bank Of Maryland in Annapolis, Maryland.
2003-10-11 Acquired Atlantic Bank in Ocean City, Maryland.
2004-06-11 Acquired Republic Bank in Saint Petersburg, Florida.
2006-09-16 Acquired Main Street Bank in Covington, Georgia.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Home Bank in Ducktown, Tennessee.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Bank/first Citizens Bank in Cleveland, Tennessee.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Home Bank Of Tennessee in Maryville, Tennessee.
2006-12-31 Acquired Branch Banking And Trust Company Of South Carolina in Greenville, South Carolina.
2006-12-31 Acquired Branch Banking And Trust Company Of Virginia in Richmond, Virginia.
2007-08-18 Acquired Coastal Federal Bank in Myrtle Beach, South Carolina.
2008-12-12 Acquired Haven Trust Bank in Duluth, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-14 Acquired Colonial Bank in Montgomery, Alabama as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $41,505,000
Total deposits: $32,820,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Livingston County does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Livingston County, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Livingston County will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.